GA HB1010 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Cobb County, approved June 19, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, Ex. Sess., p. 2075), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 12, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 3691) and an Act approved May 12, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 4048), so as to change the provisions relating to the compensation of the chairperson and the other commissioners of the board; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; Board of Commissioners; compensation of the chairperson and other commissioners; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #599 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #582 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #582 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-28 | Act 499 | |
2016-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-11 | House | House Hopper |