GA HB1007 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Crawford County, approved March 2, 1874 (Ga. L. 1874, p. 339), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 5, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4012), so as to revise districts for the election of members of the board of commissioners; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for election and terms of office of subsequent members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crawford County; Board of Commissioners; revise member districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #465 (Y: 142 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #465 (Y: 142 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 346 | |
2022-02-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-15 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-01 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-25 | House | House Hopper |