GA HB1007 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-10-6 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sale of real or personal property to political subdivision by local officer or employee, so as to increase the maximum amount of sales of personal property that is exempt from the prohibitions of the Code section; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; sales to political subdivisions; maximum amount exempt; increase
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Grant [R] | Rep. Doug Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #835 - Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 405 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-11 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-17 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-01 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-28 | House First Readers |