FL S1530 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1365
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1365
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting counties and municipalities from authorizing or otherwise allowing public camping or sleeping on public property without certification of designated public property by the Department of Children and Families; authorizing counties to designate certain public property for such uses for a specified time period; requiring the Department of Children and Families to certify such designation; requiring a county to submit a request to the secretary of the department which includes certification of and documentation proving certain information, etc.
Title
Unauthorized Public Camping and Public Sleeping
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1365 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1365 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 12 NAYS 5 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-07 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Rules |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 3 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1365 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Chapter No. 2024-11