FL S1280 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Agency for Persons with Disabilities to provide certain notice of eligibility determinations; revising provisions relating to court appointment of certain qualified experts to evaluate a defendant's mental condition; revising provisions governing acceptable recommended training for a defendant determined incompetent to proceed; requiring the court to hold a competency hearing within a specified timeframe when a defendant is competent to proceed; providing for the court to retain jurisdiction over certain defendants found nonrestorable to competency, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Involuntary Commitment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-15SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-02-14SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-12SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/12/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-12-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H985 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
916301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9163012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
916302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9163025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
916303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
916304Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback