FL S1180 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that certain requests for travel authorization by county or municipal public officers be approved by the governing body of the county or municipality at a regularly scheduled meeting; requiring that approved travel be posted on the county's or municipality's website for a specified timeframe, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County and Municipal Public Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-23SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-21SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-20SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/20/18, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-02-15SenateNow in Community Affairs
2018-02-14SenateCS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
2018-02-14SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-13SenateCS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-12-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H815 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
99061Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback