FL S0960 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 721
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting a provision requiring the Department of Children and Families to develop a certification process by rule for community substance abuse prevention coalitions; excluding certain substance abuse programs from specified licensure requirements; requiring the department to request a defendant's medical information from a jail within a certain timeframe after receiving a commitment order and other required documentation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health and Substance Abuse

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 721
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/HB 721
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-02-20SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-15SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-24SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-24SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-11SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-01-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-09SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-11-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H721 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
397321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91615Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback