FL S0866 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a post-trial counseling program for jurors in each judicial circuit; providing the program's purpose; requiring the Office of the State Courts Administrator to provide administrative support for the program; requiring the judicial circuit to provide a specified number of counseling sessions at no charge to a juror under certain circumstances; prohibiting a clerk of the court from releasing the name of a juror who requests post-trial counseling services, etc.
Title
Post-trial Counseling Services for Jurors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H999 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/866 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/866/BillText/Filed/HTML |