FL S0806 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 703
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a water management district to publish its notice of intention to sell surplus lands on its website; revising the circumstances when a water management district must publish its intention to sell surplus lands; revising the process for selling certain lower valued surplus lands; defining the term "adjacent property owners", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Management District Surplus Lands

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 703
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/HB 703
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time 912
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-02SenateCS by Rules read 1st time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-01SenateCS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-01-24SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-23SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-16SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/16/18, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-17SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-11-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S808 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 705
H703 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-155
H705 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-156

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
373089Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback