FL S0766 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 343 (Ch. 2017-81)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the offenses of using a scanning device or reencoder with the intent to defraud; prohibiting the use of a skimming device with intent to defraud; prohibiting the possession, sale, or delivery of a skimming device, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment Card Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 343 (Ch. 2017-81)
2017-04-28SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 343
2017-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-26SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-26SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-04-25SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2017-04-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-04-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-04-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2017-04-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/18/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-04-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2017-04-04SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2017-04-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-04-03SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/03/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0343 (Similar To) 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-81

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback