FL S0314 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from regulation under parts I and II of ch. 494, F.S., for certain securities dealers, investment advisers, and associated persons, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgage Brokering

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 193
2018-02-08SenateSubstituted HB 193
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-24SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-23SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-07SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2017-12-07SenateFavorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 12/07/17, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-10-12SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2017-09-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S282 (Similar To) 2017-09-19 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H193 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-44

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
49400115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback