FL S0112 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing physician assistants and advanced registered nurse practitioners to execute a certificate under certain conditions stating that they have examined a person and find the person appears to meet the criteria for involuntary examination, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Involuntary Examinations Under the Baker Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-14SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-13SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-24SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2018-01-23SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H573 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394496Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3949085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7442007Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback