FL S0078 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to establish an online verification system for motor vehicle insurance; authorizing law enforcement officers to access information from the system for specified purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance Online Verification System

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H441 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3240221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324252Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback