FL H4603 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Tampa Bay Career Pathways Collaborative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tampa Bay Career Pathways Collaborative

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-18HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-09HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback