FL H1435 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DCF, in collaboration with sheriffs' offices that conduct child protective investigations & community-based care lead agencies, to develop statewide family-finding program; authorizes community-based care lead agencies to establish kinship navigator programs; requires court to request that parents consent to providing access to additional records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#824 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Chapter No. 2018-108
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 590
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-03-06SenateReceived
2018-03-06SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-03-06SenateIn Messages
2018-03-06HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2018-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-05HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-21HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-02-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-19HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseCS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-02-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-13HouseCS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall
2018-02-05HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-31HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-31HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S590 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1435

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback