FL H1119 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises district boundaries; requires referendum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lakewood Ranch Stewardship District, Manatee and Sarasota Counties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#55 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#788 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-178
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Rules
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 1
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HouseCS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time 667
2018-02-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-22HouseCS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-14HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-14HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-02-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/14/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-29HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2018-01-29HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-02HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback