FL H0727 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes qualified experts to advise & provide certain inspections for places of public accommodation relating to ADA; authorizes certain owners of place of public accommodation to file certificate of conformity or remediation plan with DBPR; provides requirements for such submission; requires court to consider certain information in specified actions; requires department to develop & maintain website for specified purposes; provides an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accessibility of Places of Public Accommodation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#376 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2017-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-01SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1398
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-04-28SenateReceived
2017-04-28SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-04-28SenateIn Messages
2017-04-28HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-27HouseAmendment(s) adopted (239023)
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-24HouseCS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-24HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-24HouseCS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2017-04-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/24/17, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2017-04-07HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2017-04-04HouseCS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-04-04HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-04HouseCS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-03-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/04/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-03-30HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-03-29HouseCS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-29HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-28HouseCS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-03-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-02-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1398 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 727

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5535141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0727/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727/Amendment/893317/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727/Amendment/239023/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727/Amendment/802057/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727/Vote/HouseVote_h00727e1376.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/727/Vote/SenateVote_h00727e1014.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback