FL H0649 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Medicaid to reimburse for dental services provided by certain mobile dental units; creates Council on Dental Therapy; specifies licensure requirements, services, limitations, & prohibitions relating to practice of dental therapy; requires DOH, in consultation with Board of Dentistry & AHCA, to submit reports to Legislature by specified dates; requires specified information & recommendations to be included in such reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental Therapy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall -- Workshopped
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S684 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H471 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S686 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4660285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback