FL H0333 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Defining the term "special operations forces"; exempting certain applicants from completing a basic recruit training program approved by the Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission under specified conditions; requiring an employing agency, training center, or criminal justice selection center to verify and document that certain applicants have served in the special operations forces for a minimum period and completed certain training if they seek an exemption from the commission-approved basic recruit training program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum Officer Qualifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#626 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Chapter No. 2018-46
2018-03-21 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-07HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-07SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 876
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 470
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 1
2018-02-14HouseAmendment(s) adopted (399147) 587
2018-02-14HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-01HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-26HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-26HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2018-01-26HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-25HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-24HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-10-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S470 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 333

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
626989Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9431395Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback