DE SJR2 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
This Resolution provides the official revenue, refund, and unencumbered funds estimates for Fiscal Year 2020.
Title
The Official General Fund Revenue Estimate For Fiscal Year 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2020-06-24 | Vote type changed from Simple Majority (SM) to Simple Majority (SM) by virtue of the Presiding Member's decision | |
2020-06-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2020-06-24 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2020-06-24 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2020-06-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2020-06-23 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2020-06-23 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2020-06-22 | Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate |