DE SCR20 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Concurrent Resolution establishes a task force to study the issue of the local extinction of species in Delaware and recommend solutions to reverse the present course. The task force is required to deliver its report no later than December 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing The Statewide Ecological Extinction Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-04 Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-04 Amendment HA 1 to SCR 20 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-04 Amendment HA 1 to SCR 20 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 4 NO 1 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Introduced in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback