DE SB98 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Under the new Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) it requires that private health plans cover evidence-based preventive services and immunization. The Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act has recommended vaccinations, health screenings and children’s wellness visits, must be covered for all new health plans starting with plan years beginning on or after Sept. 23, 2010 This ACT will bring Delaware in line with the requirements of PPACA and provide the Delaware Insurance Department with regulatory and enforcement authority over carriers as respects to immunizations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance And The Requirement Of Coverage For Certain Immunizations And Preventive Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2011-06-15 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-15 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2011-06-08 | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate |