DE SB94 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires the Department to develop a regulation for the identification of a “military-connected youth”. The Act further provides that this identification is not a public record, is protected by the federal Family Educational and Privacy Act and shall not be used for purposes of determining school achievement, growth or performance. The purpose of this identification is to ensure the necessary individuals at the school level are aware of any military connected youth for services and supports.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To A Military Connected Identifier In Delaware Public Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] |
Rep. William Carson [D] | Rep. Sean Lynn [D] | Rep. Bryon Short [D] | Rep. Melanie Smith [D] |
Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |