DE SB78 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act enhances penalties for drivers who cause serious physical injury, as defined in § 222 of Title 11, to a vulnerable user, as defined in this Act. For a person to be guilty under this Act, the injured vulnerable user must be lawfully using a highway, defined in § 101 of Title 29 as "the entire width between boundary lines of every way or place of whatever nature open to the use of the public as a matter of right for purposes of vehicular travel . . . ."
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Rules Of The Road.
Sponsors
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] |
Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-22 | Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House | |
2017-06-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2017-06-21 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 78 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |