DE SB77 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

As a result of the passage of the in Inland Bays Aquaculture Act, numerous ongoing concerns have been raised during subsequent public meetings and a public hearing. As a result of those meetings, the Secretary's Order No. 2016-W-0049 reduced the number and location of leasable sites, and eliminated oyster aquaculture in the Little Assawoman Bay. This Act seeks to ensure the following: sites eliminated in the Secretary's Order cannot be considered for leasing for aquaculture; the elimination of poles as a form of markings of any and all leased sites within the Little Assawoman Bay; and limiting all aquaculture leased sites in the Little Assawoman Bay to hard clams only.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Aquaculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
2017-05-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2017-05-03 Introduced and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback