DE SB75 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes the following changes to provisions required in life insurance policies issued in this State:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Payment Of Life Insurance Claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-06-05 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2019-05-13 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
2019-05-09 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-04-17 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2019-04-16 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback