DE SB74 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 of this Act updates the Delaware Code relating to the Board of Landscape Architects by clarifying what is required to be qualified for licensure as a landscape architect in Delaware. Section 2 of this Act eliminates the requirement to obtain a business license under 210.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Landscape Architects.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] |
Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-01-19 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2015-05-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |