DE SB70 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Sections 1 and 7. These sections amend Sections 15-108(d) and 15-1102(a)(1)(a) of the Act to clarify and confirm the distinction between domestic partnerships and foreign partnerships and to make certain other conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Chapter 15, Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Creation, Regulation, Operation And Dissolution Of Domestic Partnerships And The Registration And Regulation Of Foreign Limited Liability Partnerships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2017-06-07 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2017-06-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-05-05 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback