DE SB56 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This is an omnibus bill that updates several aspects of the Delaware Public Utility Code, Title 26, including the following: (a) Expanding the public notice options for the Public Service Commission in order to reduce costs, increase transparency, and raise public awareness of Commission proceedings; (b) Amending the statute which sets the salary of Commissioners to provide for a salary as appropriated in the annual State Operating Budget; (c) Increasing the utility assessment rate; and (d) Eliminating references to the Water Supply Coordinating Council, which reached its sunset date of January 31, 2022.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Public Service Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-14 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-06 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-06 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 56 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2023-06-06 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 56 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 7 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2023-03-10 | Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House | |
2023-03-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-03-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2023-03-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate |