DE SB5 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The United States Supreme Courts decisions in Roe v. Wade and subsequent cases established that access to abortion is a constitutional right and that states may not prohibit abortion prior to viability. As a result of these decisions, and the exercise of prosecutorial discretion by the Attorney General, see Del. Op. Atty Gen. No. 73-030, ยง III (Apr. 12, 1973), the Delaware Code's prohibitions against abortion are unconstitutional, and thus unenforceable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Codifying U.s. Supreme Court Precedent Relating To The Termination Of Pregnancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08 Signed by Governor
2017-06-06 Passed By House. Votes: 22 YES 16 NO 3 ABSENT
2017-06-06 Amendment HA 5 to SS 1 - Defeated By House. Votes: 14 YES 24 NO 3 ABSENT
2017-06-06 Amendment HA 4 to SS 1 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 20 NO 3 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT
2017-06-06 Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 23 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-05-10 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-05-09 Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 7 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 6 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 9 YES 8 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 6 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 5 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 7 YES 11 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 5 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 7 YES 11 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 5 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 4 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 4 YES 11 NO 5 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 4 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 4 YES 11 NO 5 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 4 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 3 to SS 1 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 7 YES 11 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 3 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Laid On Table in Senate
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Laid On Table in Senate
2017-05-09 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-04 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 5

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback