DE SB48 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill relates to the Sussex Conservation District and implements the recommendations of the Joint Sunset Committee. It changes all references to Levy Court in Sussex County to the Sussex County Council.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Conservation Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-06 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-06-18 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-10 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2009-05-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-08 | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-25 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate |