DE SB305 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Amendment HA 1 to SB 305 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Amendment HA 1 to SB 305 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act, known as the Delaware Climate Change Solutions Act, follows the issuance of Delawares Climate Action Plan in 2021, and establishes a statutory requirement of greenhouse gas emissions reductions over the medium and long term to mitigate the adverse effects of climate change due to anthropogenic greenhouse gas emissions on the State, establishing a mandatory and regularly updated plan to achieve those emissions reductions and develop resilience strategies for the State, and requires State agencies to address climate change in decision-making and rulemaking.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 7 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 305 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-10 | Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House | |
2022-06-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 6 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-09 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 305 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-09 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 305 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment & Energy) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2022-06-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee in Senate |