DE SB3 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Substitute amends Senate Bill No. 3 by doing the following:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 And Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Deadly Weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23 Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-05-13 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2021-05-11 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable
2021-04-15 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2021-04-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 8 NO
2021-04-01 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 3

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback