DE SB291 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act removes the registration of trade names for sole proprietorships, partnerships, and associations in the Superior Court prothonotaries and places registration of such trade names with the Division of Revenue. Additionally, this Act provides that the filing of certificates will be recorded electronically and the fee for such filing is $25.00. Under Superior Court Civil R. 77(h), the current filing fee is $25.00. This change updates the statute consistent with the current fee collected by the Superior Court.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Registration Of Trade Names, Partnerships And Associations In The Superior Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2024-05-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |