DE SB29 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To foster sustainability in state retiree healthcare benefits and the development of a plan for strong benefits beyond the current Medicare Supplement plan offered through January 1, 2024, this Act does all of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Employee Benefits Consolidation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-01-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2023-01-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-01-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-01-19 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2023-01-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 3 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2023-01-18 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 29 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-01-18 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 29 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-01-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |
2023-01-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |