DE SB28 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill allows a per diem employee of the legislature who receives a service pension to be exempt from the earnings limit while working for the legislature.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pensions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-13 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2013-05-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Re-Assigned to Finance committee in Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 28 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Committee in Senate |