DE SB265 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill establishes an Inclusive Statewide Stroke Care System to improve stroke care and survival in the State of Delaware. This bill requires the Secretary of Health and Social Services to designate acute health care facilities that meet certain accreditation requirements as comprehensive stroke centers, primary stroke centers, acute stroke ready centers, and other distinct categories of stroke center certification. The bill also establishes a standing Stroke System Committee to assist in the oversight of the Inclusive Statewide Stroke Care System and provide recommendations for its implementation and maintenance.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To A Statewide Stroke Care System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-23 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2016-06-15 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |