DE SB256 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill re-constitutes the Council on Correction.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Council On Correction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-30 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-06-24 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADULT & JUVENILE CORRECTIONS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Adult & Juvenile Corrections Committee in Senate |