DE SB254 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Amendment SA 3 to SB 254 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill raises the civil penalty for a violation of section 3503 of the Workplace Fraud Act ("Act") from a range of $1,000 to $5,000 to $5,000 to $20,000. The bill also raises the civil penalty for wrongful discharge or discrimination under the Act from a range of $5,000 to $10,000 to $20,000 to $50,000. Finally, this bill provides that civil penalties and other revenue collected will be retained by the Department of Labor for enforcement purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Workplace Fraud.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Amendment SA 3 to SB 254 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-30 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-30 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-06-30 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-21 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-06-21 Amendment SA 2 to SB 254 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 9 YES 8 NO 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2018-06-21 Amendment SA 1 to SB 254 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 8 NO 2 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-19 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback