DE SB253 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds provisions to 4004 of Title 7 to exclude from Chapter 40 of Title 7 land disturbing activities of 1 acre or less of land and to exclude from the requirement for a sediment and stormwater management plan the construction of an agricultural structure construction project subject to a standard plan. If the Department provides for the use of a standard plan in lieu of a detailed sediment and stormwater plan, this Act requires the Department to provide that an agricultural structure construction project with a total land disturbance of 10 acres or less is entitled to a standard plan.Notwithstanding the regulatory power granted to the Department by 4006(a) through (c) of Title 7, this Act creates 4006(e) of Title 7 to prohibit the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control (“Department”) from promulgating a regulation that relies on a stormwater runoff volume reduction approach. It is the General Assembly’s intent that this prohibition result in the Department repealing the existing Sediment and Stormwater Regulations, 5101, Title 7 of the Delaware Administrative Code, (“Sediment and Stormwater Regulations”) and replacing them with a responsible state stormwater management program that can be complied with without extensive offset payments.This Act amends 4006(d) to make clear that the Department may promulgate regulations only after a public hearing.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Erosion And Sediment Control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-23 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |