DE SB249 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act has the effect of renaming the Delaware Department of Agriculture Main Administration Building at 2320 South DuPont Highway, Dover, Delaware as the “Richard S. Cordrey Building” in honor of the Honorable Richard S. Cordrey of Millsboro, former Delaware State Representative, State Senator, and Secretary of Finance. This gesture is made because of his exemplary service to the State of Delaware in numerous challenging capacities and because of his lifelong dedication to farming and to Delaware’s agricultural traditions.
Title
An Act To Rename The Main Administration Building Of The Delaware Department Of Agriculture In Honor Of Former Delaware State Representative, State Senator And Secretary Of Finance Richard S. Cordrey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House | |
2012-06-21 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-21 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-21 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2012-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-13 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |