DE SB24 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
The intent of this Act is to reduce the amount of waste that ends up in the environment and to raise awareness of the need to properly dispose of balloons. To that end, this Act imposes a civil penalty for the violation of intentionally releasing 5 or more balloons filled with air or lighter-than-air gases, to prevent litter which blights our communities and environment and causes harm to wildlife and marine animals. The release of multiple balloons at 1 time is a single offense under this Act. This Act also establishes that intentionally releasing 1 to 4 balloons at 1 time is littering.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Litter Control Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 2 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2021-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 6 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-12 | Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House | |
2021-03-11 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING | |
2021-03-11 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 24 |