DE SB238 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds "victim of kidnapping" to the definition section of the Address Confidentiality Act, allowing for kidnapping victims to become eligible for the protections offered by the Address Confidentiality Program. This amendment is recommended and supported by the National Center for Missing & Exploited Children to better protect kidnapping victims and their families.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Protection Of Crime Victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2024-03-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-03-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |