DE SB238 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Under current law, a person may deposit, for a fee, an original will with the Register of Wills in New Castle County for safekeeping. The person is not required to be a resident of New Castle County, but only the New Castle County Register of Wills is authorized to store original wills.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Register Of Wills.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2018-06-19 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-19 Amendment SA 1 to SB 238 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Amendment SA 1 to SB 238 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-09 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback