DE SB236 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act amends the Charter of Dewey Beach to give the Town Commissioners the authority to impose and collect a lodging tax. The new lodging tax is distinct from the existing accommodations tax. A rental property may be subject to either the accommodations tax or the lodging tax, but not both. In addition, the lodging tax may not be imposed before April 1, 2021, the initial rate may not exceed 1.5%, and the rate may not be increased by no more than .5% annually until the maximum rate, 3%, is reached.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of Dewey Beach Relating To The Power To Impose And Collect A Lodging Tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2020-06-24 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-06-24 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-06-22 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2020-06-19 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-06-16 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2020-06-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-06-16 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-06-10 Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback