DE SB232 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act expands the total number of vice-chancellors on the Court of Chancery to 6 and makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Vice-chancellors Of The Court Of Chancery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-13 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2018-06-12 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-12 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-06-06 | Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate |