DE SB231 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This is a housekeeping bill. Sections 1 and 2 present identical language to that of the first two sections of HB 15 that was passed in June 2015 affecting captive insurance. The title to HB 15 was limited to captive insurance, but the effect of the changes to Sections 309 and 330 would not be limited to captive insurance. There was a question as to whether the amendments to these two provisions were beyond the scope of the title, so the same changes are being made under a broader title heading in this new bill. Section 3 authorizes the Insurance Commissioner to take action against an insurer’s Certificate of Authority to transact business for violations of the Delaware Code outside of Title 18 but which specifically impose obligations upon insurance carriers. While there are provisions in the Insurance Code that discuss the Commissioner’s authority to revoke or suspend a Certificate of Authority, this amendment clarifies that the Insurance Commissioner’s authority over insurance carriers extends to violations of other provisions in the Delaware Code that apply to regulated insurance carriers. Section 4 corrects an error and deletes Section 2708(4)b. as was originally intended from legislation that passed in 1998. Section 5 corrects a typographical error.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Rep. Bryon Short [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Rep. Ronald Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2016-05-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE & TELECOMMUNICATIONS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance & Telecommunications Committee in Senate |