DE SB228 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill prohibits, for the purposes of public safety and wildlife conservation, use of devices that amplify light to hunt wild birds or wild animals at nighttime. The bill also allows use of artificial light to hunt frogs from a boat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Prohibition Against The Use Of Lights For Hunting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-27 Signed by Governor
2012-06-26 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2012-06-14 Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
2012-06-13 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-13 Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-13 Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
2012-06-13 Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
2012-06-12 Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2012-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2012-05-16 Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate
2012-05-16 Assigned to Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback