DE SB225 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act encourages prescribers and patients to use proven non-opioid methods of treating back pain by doing the following:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16, Title 24, Title 29, And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Coverage For The Treatment Of Back Pain.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10 Signed by Governor
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 11 On Its Merits
2018-06-27 Re-Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2018-06-22 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
2018-06-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 5 NO 2 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT
2018-06-21 Amendment SA 2 to SB 225 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-21 Amendment SA 1 to SB 225 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Amendment SA 2 to SB 225 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-14 Amendment SA 1 to SB 225 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback