DE SB22 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides for insurance coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorders.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Autism Spectrum Disorders Coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-27 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-27 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2012-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2012-06-07 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-07 | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-07 | Amendment SA 2 - Stricken | |
2012-06-07 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2012-05-02 | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2011-05-31 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |